OK HB1447 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB1447

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Referred to Banking and Business
Pending: House Banking and Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Law Enforcement Retirement System; disability benefits; administrative leave pay; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law Enforcement Retirement System; disability benefits; administrative leave pay; effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05HouseReferred to Banking and Business
2018-02-05HouseWithdrawn from Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee
2017-02-21HouseReferred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Roberts (Dustin)
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1447 (Carry Over) 2017-02-21 - Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
472305New CodeSee Bill Text
472310New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback