OK HB1441 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-04 - Approved by Governor 04/04/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Professions and occupations; maintaining emergency medication kit in certain facilities; effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; maintaining emergency medication kit in certain facilities; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Clark Jolley [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-29 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-04 | Approved by Governor 04/04/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-03-30 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-29 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-03-29 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-03-29 | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-29 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-23 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-14 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2011-03-03 | First Reading | |
2011-03-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-02 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-02 | General Order | |
2011-02-23 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Public Health Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Cox | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |