OK HB1437 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; expanding Oklahoma Agriculture Enhancement and Diversification Program category.
Title
Agriculture; expanding Oklahoma Agriculture Enhancement and Diversification Program category.
Sponsors
Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. John Pfeiffer [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] |
Rep. David Perryman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development committee; CR filed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Perryman |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 6 |
2015-02-23 | House | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs, Sherrer |
2015-02-23 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Emergency added |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |