OK HB1431 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1431
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; Sorghum Resources Act; updating references; repealer; effective date.
Title
Agriculture; Sorghum Resources Act; updating references; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2 |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-27 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 5 |
2017-02-27 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Pederson (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hilbert |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1431 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 18 | 241 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 242 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 243 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 244 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 245 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 246 | New Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 247 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 249 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 250 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 18 | 251 | New Code | See Bill Text |