OK HB1425 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Fees; surcharges for use of credit or debit cards; providing for certain fees for online transactions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees; surcharges for use of credit or debit cards; providing for certain fees for online transactions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28SenateTitle stricken
2019-03-28SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
2019-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseAuthored by Senator Montgomery (principal Senate author)
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-18HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
2019-02-06HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Loring
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback