OK HB1408 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1408
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public health and safety; First Responders Job Protection Act; definitions; first responders to report passive drug exposure; reports of passive drug exposure be provided to medical review officer; codification; effective date.
Title
Public health and safety; First Responders Job Protection Act; definitions; first responders to report passive drug exposure; reports of passive drug exposure be provided to medical review officer; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: drug exposure be provided to (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - House - House: Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-01 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 |
2023-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-20 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Gollihare (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-06 | House | General Order |
2023-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Culver |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1408 (Carry Over) 2023-05-01 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023