OK HB1408 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1408
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Public Safety
Pending: Senate Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles; driver licenses; requirements for restricted commercial driver license for farm-related service industries; effective date; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; driver licenses; requirements for restricted commercial driver license for farm-related service industries; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2022-03-28 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-28 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Murdock (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-02 | House | Emergency added |
2022-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2022-02-21 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pfeiffer |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1408 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to Rules