OK HB1407 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; assessment percentages; notice; publications; meetings; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; assessment percentages; notice; publications; meetings; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-23 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-14 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Motion expired |
2015-03-02 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Pfeiffer |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 42 |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-23 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |