OK HB1396 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-20 - CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; abortions; modifying prohibition; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; abortions; modifying prohibition; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass Public Health Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Townley
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback