OK HB1395 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-19 - Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; changing requirement to provide full-day kindergarten; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; changing requirement to provide full-day kindergarten; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-11 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 72 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-18 | Senate | coauthored by Sharp |
2013-03-12 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-12 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 9; Ayes: 72 Nays: 17 |
2013-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-11 | House | General Order |
2013-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Smalley |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |