OK HB1393 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future HB1393

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-01 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles; modifying responsible entity; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles; modifying responsible entity; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-13 - Senate - Senate: Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-01HouseApproved by Governor 04/28/2023
2023-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2023-04-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2023-04-20HouseReferred for enrollment
2023-04-20SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2023-04-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2023-04-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-04-13SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2023-03-23SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2023-02-21SenateFirst Reading
2023-02-21HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2023-02-20HouseReferred for engrossment
2023-02-20HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2023-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2023-02-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey
2023-02-20HouseGeneral Order
2023-02-08HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2023-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2023-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Bashore
2023-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

HB1393 (Carry Over) 2023-05-01 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1393&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/hB/HB1393%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/HB1393%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/hB/HB1393%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/HB1393%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/hB/HB1393%20ENR.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/HB1393%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1393_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1393_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback