OK HB1393 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1393
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; deeming certain Investigations Division staff as peace officers; effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; deeming certain Investigations Division staff as peace officers; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-04 | House | General Order |
2019-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Dills |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1393 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019