OK HB1392 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying term; adding definition for qualified residential treatment program; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying term; adding definition for qualified residential treatment program; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-03-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0
2019-03-04HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Stark, Lawson, Sims
2019-03-04HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-21HouseAuthored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author)
2019-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Dills
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback