OK HB1392 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1392
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish; reauthorizing income tax checkoff; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; reauthorizing income tax checkoff; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2017 |
2017-05-10 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-10 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-19 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 5 |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pfeiffer |
2017-03-14 | House | Remove Representative Pfeiffer as principal House author and substitute with Representative Kerbs |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Pfeiffer |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1392 (Carry Over) 2017-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 3 | 310 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 30 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |