OK HB1391 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1391
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
State government; positions subject to the merit system; modifying exceptions; effective date.
Title
State government; positions subject to the merit system; modifying exceptions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2019-05-20 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-20 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-20 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0 |
2019-05-20 | House | CCR adopted |
2019-05-14 | House | Title restored |
2019-05-14 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Newhouse, Dahm, Montgomery, Howard, Floyd, Young |
2019-04-11 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Efficiency |
2019-04-01 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-05 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Dills |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1391 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019