OK HB1391 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State government; positions subject to the merit system; modifying exceptions; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State government; positions subject to the merit system; modifying exceptions; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-22HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22SenateMeasure passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-20SenateCCR read
2019-05-20HouseTo Senate
2019-05-20HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0
2019-05-20HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-14HouseTitle restored
2019-05-14HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-02SenateConference granted, SCs named Newhouse, Dahm, Montgomery, Howard, Floyd, Young
2019-04-11HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Government Efficiency
2019-04-01HouseSA's received
2019-04-01SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-28SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-28SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-28SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-03-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-03-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Appropriations
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2019-03-05HouseAuthored by Senator Newhouse (principal Senate author)
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-27HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Efficiency Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Government Efficiency
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Dills
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1391&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1391%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1391%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1391%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1391%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1391%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1391%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1391%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1391_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1391_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback