OK HB1385 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; prohibiting certain officials from using certain public service announcements; effective date.
Title
State government; prohibiting certain officials from using certain public service announcements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Elections and Ethics Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 14 |
2015-03-11 | House | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended |
2015-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Loveless (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Elections and Ethics Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Elections and Ethics |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Walker |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |