OK HB1384 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Passed on May 12 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/09/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Parental rights; creating the Parents' Bill of Rights; effective date.
Title
Parental rights; creating the Parents' Bill of Rights; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-12 | House | Approved by Governor 05/09/2014 |
2014-05-06 | House | Sent to Governor |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2014-05-06 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2014-05-05 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2014-05-05 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 3 |
2014-05-05 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Jolley, Standridge |
2014-05-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Scott, Ortega |
2014-05-05 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2014-04-29 | House | Request for conference rescinded |
2014-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Human Services |
2014-04-15 | House | SA's received |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2014-04-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Withdrawn from Rules committee |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Rules Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2014-02-20 | Senate | coauthored by Turner |
2014-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2014-02-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2014-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2014-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 3 |
2014-02-19 | House | Amended |
2014-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Shortey |
2014-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fisher, Cockroft, Walker, Murphey, Blackwell, Bennett |
2014-02-19 | House | General Order |
2013-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hulbert |
2013-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Human Services |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Kern |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |