OK HB1375 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1375
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Placed on General Order
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-25 - Placed on General Order
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; income tax; Oklahoma taxable income; apportionment factors; elections; definitions; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; income tax; Oklahoma taxable income; apportionment factors; elections; definitions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Finance: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2023-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 31 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | Senate | Placed on General Order |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Withdrawn from Appropriations committee |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Maynard |
2023-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2023-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 14 |
2023-03-13 | House | Amended |
2023-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kendrix |
2023-03-13 | House | General Order |
2023-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2023-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Rader (principal Senate author) |
2023-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Boatman |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1375 (Carry Over) 2023-04-25 - Placed on General Order