OK HB1375 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1375
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public safety; boat dealer market area disputes; providing that the brand of boat be considered and not the motor in certain boat package disputes; effective date.
Title
Public safety; boat dealer market area disputes; providing that the brand of boat be considered and not the motor in certain boat package disputes; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Taylor |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1375 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee