OK HB1374 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-07 - Approved by Governor 05/07/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prisons and reformatories; changing agency responsible for transporting sentenced persons; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prisons and reformatories; changing agency responsible for transporting sentenced persons; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-07HouseApproved by Governor 05/07/2019
2019-05-02HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-02SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-02HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-01HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-01HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2019-05-01HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-24HouseSA's received
2019-04-24SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-23SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-04-23SenateTitle restored
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-25SenateReported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed
2019-03-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Bergstrom
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-18SenateFirst Reading
2019-02-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-02-14HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-02-14HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2019-02-14HouseTitle stricken
2019-02-14HouseAmended
2019-02-14HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2019-02-14HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Davis, Lawson
2019-02-14HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-11HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Meredith
2019-02-11HouseCR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Safety
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Taylor
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1374&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1374%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1374%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1374%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1374%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1374%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1374%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1374%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1374_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1374_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback