OK HB1374 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1374
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-12 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; creating the Public Safety Protection District Act; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; creating the Public Safety Protection District Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 54 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 82 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 54 Nays: 35 |
2017-03-22 | House | Amended |
2017-03-22 | House | House Rule suspended |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget General Government Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Watson |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1374 (Carry Over) 2017-04-12 - Title stricken
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
11 | 29 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 152 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 153 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 154 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 155 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 156 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 157 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 158 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 159 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
11 | 29 | 160 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |