OK HB1371 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 15 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Marriage; deleting date requirement for certain appointments; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Marriage; deleting date requirement for certain appointments; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-04 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-15HouseApproved by Governor 05/12/2017
2017-05-08HouseSent to Governor
2017-05-08SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2017-05-08HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2017-05-04HouseReferred for enrollment
2017-05-04HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 1
2017-05-04HouseSA's read, adopted
2017-04-26HouseSA's received
2017-04-26SenateEngrossed to House
2017-04-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2017-04-25SenateEnacting clause restored
2017-04-25SenateTitle restored
2017-04-25SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-04-12SenateEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-12SenateReported Do Pass as amended Rules committee; CR filed
2017-03-27SenateSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-03-22SenateFirst Reading
2017-03-22HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-03-21HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2017-03-21HouseTitle stricken
2017-03-21HouseAmended
2017-03-21HouseGeneral Order
2017-02-21HouseAuthored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author)
2017-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass Rules Committee
2017-02-07HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2017-02-06HouseAuthored by Representative Tadlock
2017-02-06HouseFirst Reading

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
431101aNew CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1371&Session=1700
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/hB/HB1371%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/HB1371%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/hB/HB1371%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/HB1371%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1371%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/hB/HB1371%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/HB1371_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/HB1371_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback