OK HB1366 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1366
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Notaries public; modifying provisions relating to notaries public; effective date.
Title
Notaries public; modifying provisions relating to notaries public; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1 |
2017-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Murphey |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Hall |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1366 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 1 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 113 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
49 | 6 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |