OK HB1365 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1365
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Transportation; creating the Office of Mobility and Public Transit; transferring certain responsibilities and programs; effective date; emergency.
Title
Transportation; creating the Office of Mobility and Public Transit; transferring certain responsibilities and programs; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Bush [R] | Sen. Rob Standridge [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Rusty Cornwell [R] | Sen. Joseph Silk [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-25 | House | Approved by Governor 04/25/2019 |
2019-04-23 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-22 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-17 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Silk |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-05 | House | Amended |
2019-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, McDugle |
2019-03-05 | House | General Order |
2019-02-20 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-20 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, Frix |
2019-02-20 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Referred to Transportation |
2019-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Bush |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1365 (Carry Over) 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019