OK HB1365 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Transportation; creating the Office of Mobility and Public Transit; transferring certain responsibilities and programs; effective date; emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Transportation; creating the Office of Mobility and Public Transit; transferring certain responsibilities and programs; effective date; emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-25HouseApproved by Governor 04/25/2019
2019-04-23HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-23SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-23HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-22HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 99 Nays: 0
2019-04-22HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-17HouseSA's received
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-16SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2
2019-04-16SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-04-16SenateEnacting clause restored
2019-04-16SenateTitle restored
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-04-03SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-04-03SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-03-26SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-03-26SenateEnacting clause stricken
2019-03-26SenateReported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateCoauthored by Senator Silk
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0
2019-03-05HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-05HouseAmended
2019-03-05HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey, McDugle
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-20HouseAuthored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author)
2019-02-20HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Cornwell, Frix
2019-02-20HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation Committee
2019-02-11HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-02-11HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee
2019-02-11HouseWithdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
2019-02-07HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Bush
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1365&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1365%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1365%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1365%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1365%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1365%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1365%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1365%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1365_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1365_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback