OK HB1364 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Amusements and sports; Oklahoma State Athletic Commission; effective date.
Title
Amusements and sports; Oklahoma State Athletic Commission; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Tourism and International Relations Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Tourism and International Relations Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations Subcommittee on Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2013 |
2013-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-05-09 | House | Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0 |
2013-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2013-04-29 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 |
2013-02-18 | House | Amended |
2013-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman |
2013-02-18 | House | General Order |
2013-02-07 | House | Authored by Senator Bass (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Tourism and International Relations Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Tourism and International Relations |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Kirby |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3A | 604 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 604 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |