OK HB1361 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Records of the Department of Public Safety; relating to Open Records Act; procedures for reproduce records; authorizing denial of requests; effective date.
Title
Records of the Department of Public Safety; relating to Open Records Act; procedures for reproduce records; authorizing denial of requests; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Sparks (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Loring |
2015-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Griffith |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 2 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |