OK HB1358 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1358
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 24 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-29 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; Inflation Relief Stimulus Fund; appropriation; creating the Inflation Stimulus Relief Fund; deposits; distribution; eligible taxpayers; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public finance; Inflation Relief Stimulus Fund; appropriation; creating the Inflation Stimulus Relief Fund; deposits; distribution; eligible taxpayers; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Sen. Mark Allen [R] | Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2022-03-24 | Senate | First Reading |
2022-03-24 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2022-03-23 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-23 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 11 |
2022-03-23 | House | Title stricken |
2022-03-23 | House | Amended |
2022-03-23 | House | House Rule suspended |
2022-03-23 | House | Authored by Senator Allen (principal Senate author) |
2022-03-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace, Sims, McDugle, Hardin (Tommy) |
2022-03-23 | House | General Order |
2022-03-03 | House | Emergency added |
2022-03-03 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1358 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to Rules