OK HB1347 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; wholesaler's agent license; providing exception to certain license requirement for certain employees; employee license; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; wholesaler's agent license; providing exception to certain license requirement for certain employees; employee license; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseApproved by Governor 04/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-23SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-11SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 1
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-21HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McEntire
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback