OK HB1343 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; annual license fees; modifying certain license description; airline/railroad beverage license; allowing certain entities to permit certain activities; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; annual license fees; modifying certain license description; airline/railroad beverage license; allowing certain entities to permit certain activities; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-22HouseApproved by Governor 04/22/2019
2019-04-17HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-17SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-17HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-16HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-16SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-04SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-03-26SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-03-13SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-13HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-12HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4
2019-03-12HouseAuthored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author)
2019-03-12HouseGeneral Order
2019-03-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-02-21HouseReferred to Business and Commerce
2019-02-21HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative McEntire
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback