OK HB1331 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; adding a military student identifier to the state student data system; effective date; emergency.
Title
Schools; adding a military student identifier to the state student data system; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Common Education Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | House | Approved by Governor 04/10/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin |
2015-02-19 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Coody (Ann) |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |