OK HB1328 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - coauthored by McBride
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-22 - coauthored by McBride
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Emergency procedures and requirements; immunity for voluntary architectural or engineering services; effective date.
Title
Emergency procedures and requirements; immunity for voluntary architectural or engineering services; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Senate | coauthored by McBride |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Floyd (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Morrissette |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Cities and Towns
Civil and Criminal Procedure and Courts
Education - Common
Professions and Occupations
Property
Civil and Criminal Procedure and Courts
Education - Common
Professions and Occupations
Property
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 683 | 11a | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 683 | 11b | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
76 | 5 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |