OK HB1319 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Driving under the influence; modifying penalties; effective date.
Title
Driving under the influence; modifying penalties; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-16 - House - House: (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-05-10 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 18) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Approved by Governor 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-19 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-19 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-19 | coauthored by Shortey, Allen | |
2011-05-19 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-16 | CCR read | |
2011-05-16 | To Senate | |
2011-05-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 | |
2011-05-16 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Derby | |
2011-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-05 | Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Schulz, Branan, Brecheen, Ellis, Bass | |
2011-05-03 | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-04-20 | SA's received | |
2011-04-20 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-19 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-19 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 2 | |
2011-04-19 | Title restored | |
2011-04-19 | coauthored by Ivester | |
2011-04-19 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-11 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-31 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2011-03-31 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2011-03-31 | Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-24 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-24 | Withdrawn from Public Safety committee | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 83 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-17 | Amended | |
2011-03-17 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Farley, Reynolds, Ritze | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-01 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-01 | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Wright | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 852 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 11 | 902 | New Code | See Bill Text |