OK HB1315 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman, Tibbs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman, Tibbs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Children; relating to the placement of children in kinship foster care; modifying duties of the Department of Human Services for the placement of children in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Title
Children; relating to the placement of children in kinship foster care; modifying duties of the Department of Human Services for the placement of children in certain circumstances. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-02-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Human Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Pittman, Tibbs | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-03-02 | First Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-26 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-26 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-26 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Kern | |
2009-02-26 | General Order | |
2009-02-24 | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Human Services Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Human Services | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Ortega | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
10 | 7004 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |