OK HB1308 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Motion expired
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

School safety; threatening behavior; requiring report to law enforcement; modifying immunity; threat assessment; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

School safety; threatening behavior; requiring report to law enforcement; modifying immunity; threat assessment; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 46 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-23HouseMotion expired
2019-05-22HouseNotice served to reconsider vote by Representative Conley
2019-05-22HouseFourth Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 39
2019-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-20HouseLaid over
2019-05-20HouseCCR considered
2019-05-14HouseTitle restored
2019-05-14HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom
2019-05-14HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-07SenateConference granted, SCs named David, Stanislawski, Pemberton, Kidd, Dossett, Hicks
2019-05-01HouseSA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
2019-04-25HouseSA's received
2019-04-25SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-24SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2019-04-24SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-02SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-11HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-07HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-07HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 22
2019-03-07HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-07HouseAmended
2019-03-07HouseAuthored by Senator David (principal Senate author)
2019-03-07HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-26HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Randleman
2019-02-26HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Conley
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1308&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1308%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCS/HB1308%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1308%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1308%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1308%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1308%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1308%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1308_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1308_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback