OK HB1305 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1305
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Roads, bridges and ferries; authorizing counties to issue permits to harvest hay along the right-of-way of highways and roads; effective date.
Title
Roads, bridges and ferries; authorizing counties to issue permits to harvest hay along the right-of-way of highways and roads; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-03 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-10 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2017 |
2017-05-04 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-04 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-03 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-03 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 13 |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2017-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 2 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 23 |
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2017-03-02 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Murdock |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1305 (Carry Over) 2017-05-10 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2017