OK HB1297 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1297
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran guardianship; creating the Veterans Volunteer Guardianship Act; effective date.
Title
Veteran guardianship; creating the Veterans Volunteer Guardianship Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-19 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Luttrell |
2019-02-19 | House | General Order |
2019-02-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | Referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2019-02-07 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Miller |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1297 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee