OK HB1290 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1290
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-29 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public retirement systems; cost-of-living increases; specifying amount; comparison of benefit increases; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public retirement systems; cost-of-living increases; specifying amount; comparison of benefit increases; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-29 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Humphrey |
2024-02-29 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2024-02-27 | House | Emergency added |
2024-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Fugate |
2024-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2024-02-26 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act |
2023-03-02 | House | Referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2023-03-02 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1290 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act