OK HB1290 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; relating to the Teacher and Leader Effectiveness Evaluation System; modifying; duties.
Title
Schools; relating to the Teacher and Leader Effectiveness Evaluation System; modifying; duties.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Cannaday [D] | Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. John Ford [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Rep. Chuck Hoskin [D] | Rep. John Bennett [R] | Rep. Josh Cockroft [R] | Rep. Dennis Casey [R] |
Rep. David Perryman [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2015-02-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | House | Died in GCCA |
2015-05-12 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2015-04-28 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | coauthored by Ford |
2015-03-16 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-16 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 15 |
2015-03-11 | House | Title restored |
2015-03-11 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2015-03-11 | House | House Rule suspended |
2015-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Casey, Perryman, Sherrer, Cockroft, Hoskin |
2015-03-11 | House | Remove Representative Casey as principal House author and substitute with Representative Cannaday |
2015-03-11 | House | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Cannaday |
2015-03-11 | House | General Order |
2015-02-18 | House | Title stricken |
2015-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-18 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday |
2015-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Casey |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 3 | 129 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 6 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |