OK HB1287 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1287
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Authored by Senator Boren (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Authored by Senator Boren (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Child care; investigations; requiring Department of Human Services to complete investigation within fort-five days; effective date.
Title
Child care; investigations; requiring Department of Human Services to complete investigation within fort-five days; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Pae [R] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-27 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Authored by Senator Boren (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2019-02-28 | House | Remove Representative Lawson as principal House author and substitute with Representative Pae |
2019-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-02-27 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-06 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1287 (Carry Over) 2019-02-28 - Authored by Senator Boren (principal Senate author)