OK HB1279 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Counties and county officers; purchasing procedures; raising certain purchase limitation; effective date.
Title
Counties and county officers; purchasing procedures; raising certain purchase limitation; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-17 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Griffin (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Cockroft |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |