OK HB1278 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 15 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Approved by Governor 05/15/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Community-based service providers; establishing requirements for reductions in planned services; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Community-based service providers; establishing requirements for reductions in planned services; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-08 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseApproved by Governor 05/15/2019
2019-05-09HouseSent to Governor
2019-05-09SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-05-09HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-05-08HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-05-08HouseFourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0
2019-05-08HouseSA's read, adopted
2019-04-17HouseSA's received
2019-04-17SenateEngrossed to House
2019-04-16SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-04-16SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0
2019-04-16SenateTitle restored
2019-04-16SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-04-10SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-05SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-05HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-04HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-04HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 100 Nays: 0
2019-03-04HouseTitle stricken
2019-03-04HouseAmended
2019-03-04HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2019-03-04HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Lawson
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=hb1278&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/hB/HB1278%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/HB1278%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/hB/HB1278%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCSH/HB1278%20SCSH.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/HB1278%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/HB1278%20SAHB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/hB/HB1278%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/HB1278_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/HB1278_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback