OK HB1277 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1277
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid; billing for home- and community-based waivers; effective date.
Title
Medicaid; billing for home- and community-based waivers; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Sen. Paul Rosino [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Withdrawn from Health and Human Services committee |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-05 | House | Authored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-05 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1277 (Carry Over) 2019-04-03 - Referred to Appropriations