OK HB1277 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Medicaid; billing for home- and community-based waivers; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid; billing for home- and community-based waivers; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-13 - House - House: Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-04-03SenateWithdrawn from Health and Human Services committee
2019-03-18SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-03-06SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-06HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-05HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 0
2019-03-05HouseAuthored by Senator Rosino (principal Senate author)
2019-03-05HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-13HouseCR; Do Pass Health Services and Long-Term Care Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Health Services and Long-Term Care
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Lawson
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback