OK HB1277 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Compressed natural gas; Compressed Natural Gas Vehicle Conversion Funding Act of 2015.
Title
Compressed natural gas; Compressed Natural Gas Vehicle Conversion Funding Act of 2015.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 26 N: 53 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 56 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-02-18 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-11 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed |
2015-03-23 | Senate | coauthored by Smalley |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 56 Nays: 32; Ayes: 26 Nays: 53 |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-19 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2015-02-11 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Cockroft |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |