OK HB1274 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1274
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Child welfare; Oklahoma Children's Code; adding definition; prohibiting removal of child for situational neglect; effective date.
Title
Child welfare; Oklahoma Children's Code; adding definition; prohibiting removal of child for situational neglect; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-12 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1274 (Carry Over) 2019-03-26 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary