OK HB1273 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1273
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying when child may request court to reinstate terminated parental rights; effective date.
Title
Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying when child may request court to reinstate terminated parental rights; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/29/2019 |
2019-04-24 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-24 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-04-23 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-06 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-06 | House | General Order |
2019-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2019-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Lawson |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1273 (Carry Over) 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019