OK HB1273 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying when child may request court to reinstate terminated parental rights; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Children; Oklahoma Children's Code; modifying when child may request court to reinstate terminated parental rights; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29HouseApproved by Governor 04/29/2019
2019-04-24HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-24HouseEnrolled, signed, to Senate
2019-04-23HouseReferred for enrollment
2019-04-23SenateEngrossed measure signed, returned to House
2019-04-23SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2019-04-23SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-04-02SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-03-25SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-03-07SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-07HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-06HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
2019-03-06HouseAuthored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author)
2019-03-06HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-21HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2019-02-18HouseReferred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2019-02-18HouseWithdrawn from Judiciary Committee
2019-02-05HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Lawson
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback