OK HB1265 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 29 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; procedures; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; ad valorem taxation; procedures; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - House - House: General Government Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-29 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2013 |
2013-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-18 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Title restored |
2013-04-18 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2013-03-25 | Senate | coauthored by Cleveland |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2013-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-25 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton |
2013-02-25 | House | General Order |
2013-02-14 | House | Authored by Senator Holt (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Moore |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |